RI S2117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale of any flavored electronic nicotine delivery system.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2117.pdf |