RI S2114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local boards of canvassers discretion to substitute the physical posting in each voting district of senatorial, representative district meetings/voting district meetings for the purposes of election/publication in a newspaper local circulation.
Title
Elective Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary: Be held for further study (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary: Be held for further study (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2022) |
2022-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-06 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/05/2022) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |