RI S2112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Applies to settlement of St. Joseph Hospital Retirement Plan settlements/joint tortfeasors' releases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Hospital Conversions Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-09SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/09/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback