RI S2087 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows John Cena, Sr., to join Marissa Giammarco and Kyle Sawaia in marriage on or about May 12, 2018, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-06 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/07/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2018) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (01/23/2018) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |