RI S2085 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Coventry's sewer system enabling legislation to allow appropriations from town tax fund for wastewater system sewers/projects only after voter approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To An Amendment Of Chapter 330 Of The Public Laws Of 1997 Entitled "to Create A Sewer Authority For The Town Of Coventry And To Authorize Said Town To Plan, Construct, Finance, Operate And Maintain Sewage Works"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback