RI S2077 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Protects people with health insurance from surprise medical bills for emergency and other services by requiring a non-participating health care provider to bill an insured party only for a co-payment, or deductible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unanticipated Out-of-network Bills For Health Care Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Bills for health care services approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-07SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-31SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-05-15SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-04-11SenateMeeting postponed (04/12/2018)
2018-04-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2018)
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback