RI S2077 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protects people with health insurance from surprise medical bills for emergency and other services by requiring a non-participating health care provider to bill an insured party only for a co-payment, or deductible.
Title
Unanticipated Out-of-network Bills For Health Care Services
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Bills for health care services approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |