RI S2077 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot) (would Amend The Constitution So That In The Year 2018 And On Candidates For The Office Of Governor And Lieutenant Governor Would Form Joint Candidacies So That Voters Cast A Single Vote For A Candidate For Governor And Lieutenant Governor.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot) (would Amend The Constitution So That In The Year 2018 And On Candidates For The Office Of Governor And Lieutenant Governor Would Form Joint Candidacies So That Voters Cast A Single Vote For A Candidate For Governor And Lieutenant Governor.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016)
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback