RI S2077 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend the provisions of the general laws relating to the state car tax in order that the assessment of used motor vehicles would be based on average trade-in price, rather than retail price and would also extend the appeal period from 30 to 45 days

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle And Trailer Excise Tax Elimination Act Of 1998

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-05-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2014)
2014-01-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback