RI S2074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum tax on qualifying low-income property from eight percent (8%) of the previous year's gross scheduled rental income to ten percent (10%) of the prospective year's gross scheduled rental income.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2074.pdf |