RI S2073 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Meeting postponed (03/12/2020)
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Meeting postponed (03/12/2020)
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax assessors in the cities and towns to use the last statutory update or revaluation as the assessed valuation upon which to levy taxes regarding their real property.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2073.pdf |