RI S2072 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a nineteen percent (19%) carried interest fairness fee for investment management services in order to tax the carried interest income of hedge fund and private equity investors as traditional ordinary earned income.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2072.pdf |