RI S2063 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to provide the attorney general a report identifying and describing any untested sexual assault evidence collection kits; requires laboratories to complete their testing of such kits within 180 days.
Title
Sexual Assault--statewide Accounting Of Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits--submission And Return Of Kits
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |