RI S2062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the state earned-income credit as of January 1, 2023, to eighteen percent (18%) of the federal earned-income credit, not to exceed the amount of state income tax.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2062.pdf |