RI S2058 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Michael Zabelin to join Jennifer Anne Sabatini and Victor Simon Brodney in marriage on or about May 7, 2016, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-04SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2016-02-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2016-02-25HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2016-02-23HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (02/25/2016)
2016-02-09HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2016-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016)
2016-02-05HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2016-02-04SenateSenate read and passed
2016-02-03SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/04/2016)
2016-01-21SenateCommittee recommends passage
2016-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016)
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback