RI S2055 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Defines the term "adequate shelter" where dogs may be kept. It would limit the weight of any dog chain or tether to one-eighth (1/8) of the dogs total body weight. In addition it would limit the time dogs may be tethered outdoors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care Of Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-02-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback