RI S2046 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that all public water providers annually test and generate a report of the level of per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in their water supply.
Title
Water Resources Management
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |