RI S2035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restructures professional development investment fund to assume duties of dissemination of curriculum materials/frameworks/assessments/development plans with annual allocation of $200 per student.
Title
Paul W. Crowley Student Investment Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2035.pdf |