RI S2033 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands and clarifies what constitutes disability entitling disabled veterans to the waiver of motor vehicle registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Fees--disabled Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-10HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-09SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/09/2018)
2018-05-02SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018)
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback