RI S2031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public utilities and electric distribution companies to provide prompt and adequate service to its rate payers relating to new service and service upgrades.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2031.pdf |