RI S2030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes that manufacturers of devices capable of connecting to the Internet equip the devices with reasonable security features.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Regulatory Provisions - Internet Privacy And Security

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020)
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback