RI S2022 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SPEED RESTRICTIONS -- SCHOOL BUS SPEED LIMIT - Establishes a speed limit for school buses being driven on a limited access highway to ten miles per hour (10mph) less than the posted speed limit.
Title
Establishes a speed limit for school buses being driven on a limited access highway to ten miles per hour (10mph) less than the posted speed limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SPEED RESTRICTIONS
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SPEED RESTRICTIONS -- SCHOOL BUS SPEED LIMIT
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SPEED RESTRICTIONS
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SPEED RESTRICTIONS -- SCHOOL BUS SPEED LIMIT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2022.pdf |