RI S2022 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a child in foster care on eighteenth birthday due to filing of petition may elect to continue with DCYF and under supervision of the court until age twenty-one (21) provided certain circumstances are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proceedings In Family Court--voluntary Extension Of Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Voluntary extension of care act approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-05-23SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018)
2018-05-15SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-02-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2018)
2018-01-22SenateMeeting postponed (01/23/2018)
2018-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback