RI S2015 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the participation and input of the EOHHS, DHS, DCYF and BHDDH in medical assistance and public assistance caseload estimating conferences and the generation of monthly data to the members of the caseload estimating conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Assistance And Public Assistance Caseload Estimating Conferences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-19SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07SenateCommittee heard
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2018)
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback