RI S2008 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Meeting postponed (06/20/2018)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Internet service providers to follow Internet service neutrality requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Service Providers - Net Neutrality

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseMeeting postponed (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-05-03SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-03SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing (05/03/2018)
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback