RI S1101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Creating A Legislative Commission To Study And Advise On The Need For New Health Care Equipment And New Institutional Health Services
Title
An Act Creating A Legislative Commission To Study And Advise On The Need For New Health Care Equipment And New Institutional Health Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-07-01 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-07-01 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-30 | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S1101.pdf |