RI S1098 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits a signed release to be transmitted to the party responsible for paying the settlement or their attorney by electronic means.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Causes Of Action

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14SenateSenate read and passed
2023-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023)
2023-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-10SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2023)
2023-06-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-06-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2023)
2023-06-06SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback