RI S1092 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the property tax rate for each classification in Newport be uniform, except for non-owner occupied and owner-occupied properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes-newport

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-19SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-12HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-06-09HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/12/2023)
2023-06-08SenateSenate read and passed
2023-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023)
2023-06-02SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback