RI S1084 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the "rights of secured lenders" provision from ยง 34-36.1-2.19 be applicable to condominiums created before July 1, 1982 and creates a process for condominium associations to notify unit mortgage holders for certain association actions.
Title
Condominium Law
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S1084.pdf |