RI S1083 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Retirement Of Municipal Employees: would prevent elected city and town council members elected for the first time after November 6, 2012 from participating in the municipal employees' retirement system as a result of that elective service
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Retirement Of Municipal Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Beatrice Lanzi [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-27 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S1083.pdf |