RI S1055 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Sea Glass Technologies, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Sea Glass Technologies, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2023-06-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-08HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-06-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/08/2023)
2023-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2023-06-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023)
2023-06-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2023)
2023-05-24HouseReferred to House Corporations
2023-05-23SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-19SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/23/2023)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback