RI S1053 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a land use court within the superior court, effective January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-24SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-13SenateProposed Substitute
2023-06-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2023)
2023-05-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback