RI S1031 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Validate and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Coventry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Coventry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-24SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2023-06-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14SenateSenate read and passed
2023-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023)
2023-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-06-09SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2023)
2023-05-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023)
2023-05-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback