RI S1004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the minimum reporting campaign contribution amount that needs to be reported to the board of elections from over $100 to $25.00 for purposes of Campaign Contributions and Expenditures Reporting and the Ballot Question Advocacy and Reporting Acts.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |