RI S0999 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Requires all public schools to send out written invitations to all parents, guardians or caretakers of students inviting those parents, guardians or caretakers to an orientation at the school.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |