RI S0994 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of “approved project” to include resiliency related infrastructure projects, and further prohibits the award of financial assistance for a water pollution abatement project.
Title
Rhode Island Infrastructure Bank
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |