RI S0991 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the state department of transportation to efficiently operate a single, integrated intermodal transportation system and to address unrealized funding opportunities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Public Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2023-06-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
2023-06-10HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2023)
2023-06-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-06-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2023)
2023-06-02HouseReferred to House Finance
2023-06-01SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2023-05-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023)
2023-05-25SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-05-24SenateProposed Substitute
2023-05-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023)
2023-05-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback