RI S0980 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends historic tax credits for 3 years until December 31, 2022, projects which have been funded through the Cultural Arts and the Economy Grant program, as enacted in chapter 145 of the 2014 Pub. L., and which would have expired on December 31, 2019.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |