RI S0965 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a judge emeritus license plate for the retired family court judge, Stephen J. Capineri.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |