RI S0962 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the presiding justice of the superior court, to create a superior court diversion program.
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |