RI S0957 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-19 - Meeting postponed (06/21/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-19 - Meeting postponed (06/21/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the requirement that a credit bureau, at a minimum, utilizes at least one additional identifier to confirm the identity of the person who is the subject of the credit inquiry.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-19 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0957.pdf |