RI S0954 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a statewide body-worn camera program for police departments in the state.
Title
Statewide Body-worn Camera Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |