RI S0949 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the motion picture production company tax credit to ten million dollars ($10,000,000) and cap the available total of credits to forty million dollars ($40,000,000). This act would also eliminate the sunset provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motion Picture Production Tax Credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17HouseReferred to House Finance
2023-05-16SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-10SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/16/2023)
2023-05-09SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023)
2023-04-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback