RI S0949 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Subjects toll violators of out-of-state tolled projects to license and registration denial under certain circumstances
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Registration of vehicles (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Registration of vehicles (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |