RI S0943 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the department of elementary and secondary education to convene a group of stakeholders to review the standards for grade level promotion established by local education agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promotion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-05-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback