RI S0936 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school committees to budget funds for field trips when creating a school budget.
Title
Fundraising For Public Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |