RI S0936 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts Woonsocket properties with a Main Street address, located between 2 Main Street (Plat 14, Lot 284) and 194 Main Street (Plat 14, Lot 139), from prohibition of the sale of alcoholic beverages within 200 feet of any school or church.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |