RI S0934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town council of the town of South Kingstown to create a municipal court and housing court and defines the respective jurisdiction of those two courts.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |