RI S0930 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commencing in fiscal year 2022, that reconstitution and control of a school or district by the department of elementary and secondary education would not exceed 2 years except for a possible 6 month extension when substantial progress is achieved.
Title
The Paul W. Crowley Rhode Island Investment Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0930.pdf |