RI S0920 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the manufacture, distribution and retail sale of vapor products in Rhode Island.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Committee heard |
2021-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0920.pdf |